+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed SEA0054
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0054
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0054
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA0054
- Adopted SF0040JC01
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Adopted SF0040JC01
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Appointed JCC01 Members Representative(s) Nicholas, B., Teeters, Throne
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appointed JCC01 Members Senator(s) Nicholas, P., Bebout, Perkins
- Did Not Concur
- Received for Concurrence
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Objection to Lay Back Pursuant to HR 9-3 Sustained
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amendment Failed
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Amendments Adopted
- Amendment Adopted
- Passed CoW
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H02
- Received for Introduction
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Amendment Failed
- Amendment Failed
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
- Amendment Adopted
- Amendments Adopted
On February 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S02
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor