+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0050
On March 5, 2010 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0050
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0050
On March 5, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0050
- Adopted SF0036JC01
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Adopted SF0036JC01
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
- Did Not Concur
- Received for Concurrence
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- H05 Recommended Do Pass
- Placed on General File
- Rereferred to H02
- H02 Recommended Do Pass
- Placed on General File
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H05
- Received for Introduction
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
- Placed on General File
- S02 Recommended Do Pass
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to S02
- Placed on General File
- S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S05
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned