+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0042
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number 91
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0042
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0042
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0042
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-0-1-0-0
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On December 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (5)
March 8, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 5, 2018: H01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 9
February 27, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 21, 2018: S01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 5
February 13, 2018: Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-0-1-0-0
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1