+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number Chapter No. 100 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0031
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0031
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0031
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0031
- Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received for Concurrence
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 57-2-1-0-0
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- COW Passed
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
- Placed on General File
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 23-6-1-0-0
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- COW Passed
- Placed on General File
- Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On December 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2015: Concur
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
February 24, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2015: Transportation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 28, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2015: Transportation
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Joint Transportation, Highways & Military Affairs Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor