+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0057
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0057
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0057
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0057
- Did Concur
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received for Concurrence
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H07 Recommended Do Pass
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S07 Recommended Do Pass
On January 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S07
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor