+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0017
- Assigned Chapter Number 35
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed SEA No. 0017
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Concurrence
- S Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0017
- S President Signed SEA No. 0017
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- H Placed on General File
- H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On December 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 2019: S Concur:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 30
February 11, 2019: H 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
- Yeas: 59
February 5, 2019: H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 9
January 16, 2019: S 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 30
January 11, 2019: S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Minerals
Type:
Primary Sponsor