+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0053
On March 5, 2010 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0053
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0053
On March 5, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0053
- Adopted SF0025JC01
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Adopted SF0025JC01
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
- Did Not Concur
- Received for Concurrence
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01
- Received for Introduction
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Laid Back Without Prejudice
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01
- Received for Introduction
On January 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (12)
+ − Sponsor
Joint Judiciary Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor