+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0030
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0030
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0030
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0030
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Did Concur
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
- Placed on General File
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S01 Recommended Do Pass
On January 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On December 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor