+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0059
- Assigned Chapter Number 119
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0059
- S President Signed SEA No. 0059
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed SEA No. 0059
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- S Concur:Failed 1-28-1-0-0
- S Appointed JCC01 Members
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- H Appointed JCC01 Members
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 40-19-1-0-0
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- S Received for Concurrence
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Laid Back
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- H Placed on General File
- H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- S COW:Rerefer to S01 - Judiciary
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
- S Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
On December 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (11)
+ − Votes (9)
April 1, 2021: H Adopted SF0025JC001: 51-8-1-0-0
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 8
April 1, 2021: H Adopted SF0025JC001: 51-8-1-0-0
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 8
April 1, 2021: S Adopted SF0025JC001: 24-5-1-0-0
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
March 30, 2021: S Concur:Failed 1-28-1-0-0
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 28
March 29, 2021: H 3rd Reading:Passed 40-19-1-0-0
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 19
March 18, 2021: H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
March 8, 2021: S 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 6
March 3, 2021: S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
January 27, 2021: S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Agriculture
Type:
Primary Sponsor