+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0019
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0019
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0019
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0019
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H10 Recommended Do Pass
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H10
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
- Placed on General File
- S10 Recommended Do Pass
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S10
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned