+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0029
- Assigned Chapter Number 56
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed SEA No. 0029
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- S President Signed SEA No. 0029
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 55-0-5-0-0
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0029
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
- S COW:Passed
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On December 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 13, 2019: H 3rd Reading:Passed 55-0-5-0-0
- Yeas: 55
February 8, 2019: H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 9
January 14, 2019: S 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 30
January 10, 2019: S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor