+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0019
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0019
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0019
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0019
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H03 Recommended Do Pass
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H03
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S03 Recommended Do Pass
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S03
- Received for Introduction
On December 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor