+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0023
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0023
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0023
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0023
- 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 30-0-0-0-0
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
February 29, 2016: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 24, 2016: H03 - Revenue
- Yeas: 9
February 12, 2016: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 6
February 9, 2016: S03 - Revenue
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
February 8, 2016: Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 30-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 30
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor