+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0057
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0057
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0057
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0057
- Did Concur
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received for Concurrence
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
- Placed on General File
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H02
- Received for Introduction
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S02 Recommended Do Pass
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S02
- Received for Introduction
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Management Council
Type:
Primary Sponsor