+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0014
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0014
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0014
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0014
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H07 Recommended Do Pass
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S07 Recommended Do Pass
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S07
- S Received for Introduction
On December 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsor
Joint Corporations, Elections and Political Subdivisions Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor