+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c)
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- H01 Motion to Do Pass Failed
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01
- Received for Introduction
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor