+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0021
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0021
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0021
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0021
- Did Concur
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received for Concurrence
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H06
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
- Placed on General File
- S06 Recommended Do Pass
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S06
- Received for Introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Joint Travel, Recreation, Wildlife and Cultural Resources Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor