+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0078
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0078
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0078
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0078
- Did Concur
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- H09 Recommended Do Pass
- Placed on General File
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09
- Received for Introduction
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S07
- Received for Introduction
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor