+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0054
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0054
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0054
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0054
- 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
- Received for Introduction
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 27, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 12
February 16, 2017: H10 - Labor
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
February 1, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 27, 2017: S10 - Labor
- Yeas: 5