+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Failed 9-48-3-0-0
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
- Placed on General File
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (4)
February 22, 2017: COW
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 48
- Present/NV: 3
February 9, 2017: H01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
February 1, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
January 30, 2017: S01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor