+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0066
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0066
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0066
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0066
- Did Concur
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received for Concurrence
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
- Placed on General File
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H10
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S10
- Received for Introduction
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned