+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- H postponed indefinitely
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- H10 - Labor:Do Pass Failed 2-7-0-0-0
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
- S Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 15, 2019: H10 - Labor:Do Pass Failed 2-7-0-0-0
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 7
February 6, 2019: S 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
- Yeas: 29
January 31, 2019: S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0
- Yeas: 3
+ − Sponsor
Kinskey
Type:
Primary Sponsor