+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Failed 14-12-1-0-3
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
- Placed on General File
- S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
- Received for Introduction
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (2)
January 30, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2017: S02 - Appropriations
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 2