+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S02 Recommended Do Pass
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to S02
- S09 Recommended Do Pass
On January 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S09
- Received for Introduction
On January 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor