+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Do Pass Failed in Accordance with HR 5-4
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S07
- Received for Introduction
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor