+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Failed 25-33-2-0-0
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
- Placed on General File
- S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
- Placed on General File
- S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
- Received for Introduction
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 2017: COW
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 2
February 15, 2017: H08 - Transportation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
February 6, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
February 2, 2017: S02 - Appropriations
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2017: S08 - Transportation
- Yeas: 5