+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0069
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0069
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0069
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0069
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted SF0014JC001: 59-1-0-0-0
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted SF0014JC001: 29-0-0-0-1
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
- Concur:Failed 0-28-0-0-2
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Concurrence
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Laid Back
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 27-1-1-0-1
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-0-0-1
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On December 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 28, 2017: Adopted SF0014JC001
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
February 27, 2017: Adopted SF0014JC001
- Yeas: 29
February 23, 2017: Concur
- Nays: 28
February 22, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 14, 2017: H07 - Corporations
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
January 20, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 17, 2017: S07 - Corporations
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsor
Joint Corporations, Elections & Political Subdivisions Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor