+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0082
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0082
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0082
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0082
- Did Concur
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received for Concurrence
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Reconsidered
- Failed 3rd Reading
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Laid Back Pursuant to SR 10-4(a)
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Laid Back Without Prejudice
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01
- Received for Introduction
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor