+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S04
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned