+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0052
- Assigned Chapter Number 102
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed SEA No. 0052
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0052
- S President Signed SEA No. 0052
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Appointed JCC01 Members
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- H Appointed JCC01 Members
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 52-5-3-0-0
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Concurrence
- S Concur:Failed 0-28-2-0-0
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
- S Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
February 21, 2019: H Adopted SF0129JC001: 57-1-2-0-0
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
February 20, 2019: S Adopted SF0129JC001: 29-0-1-0-0
- Yeas: 29
February 13, 2019: H 3rd Reading:Passed 52-5-3-0-0
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 5
February 13, 2019: S Concur:Failed 0-28-2-0-0
- Nays: 28
February 8, 2019: H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 9
February 1, 2019: S 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 30
January 29, 2019: S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Bebout
Type:
Primary Sponsor