+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- COW:Failed 10-20-0-0-0
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
- Placed on General File
- Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
- Received for Introduction
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 9, 2015: COW
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 20
February 6, 2015: Appropriations
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 3
February 5, 2015: Corporations
- Yeas: 5