+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number 131
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0048
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed SEA No. 0048
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0048
- S President Signed SEA No. 0048
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 22-8-0-0-0
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 11, 2020: H 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 5
March 6, 2020: H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 9
February 27, 2020: S 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
February 24, 2020: S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
February 13, 2020: S Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 22-8-0-0-0
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsor
Kinskey
Type:
Primary Sponsor