+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education
- Received for Introduction
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Laid Back
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
- Placed on General File
- S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- :Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
- S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- :Rerefer to S12 - Rules
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 25-4-1-0-0
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
February 22, 2018: S02 - Appropriations
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
February 21, 2018: S12 - Rules
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
February 16, 2018: Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 25-4-1-0-0
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1