+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0086
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0086
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0086
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0086
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 Recommended Do Pass
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H02
- Received for Introduction
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S02
On January 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor