+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0064
- Assigned Chapter Number 151
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0064
- S President Signed SEA No. 0064
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed SEA No. 0064
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 42-17-1-0-0
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Concurrence
- S Concur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Laid Back
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
- S Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2019: H 3rd Reading:Passed 42-17-1-0-0
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 17
February 25, 2019: S Concur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
February 14, 2019: H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
- Yeas: 8
February 5, 2019: S 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 30
January 31, 2019: S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Anselmi-Dalton
Type:
Primary Sponsor