+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0067
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0067
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0067
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0067
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
- Received for Concurrence
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Placed on General File
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
February 28, 2017: Concur
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
February 9, 2017: H01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 9
February 1, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
January 27, 2017: S01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor