+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0043
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0043
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0043
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0043
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H09 Recommended Do Pass
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S09
On January 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned