+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0035
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0035
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0035
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0035
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H08 Recommended Do Pass
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H08
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S08 Recommended Do Pass
On January 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S08
- Received for Introduction
On January 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned