+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
- Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
- Received for Introduction
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 28-1-1-0-0
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2018: H07 - Corporations
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 27, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
February 20, 2018: S07 - Corporations
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
February 16, 2018: Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 28-1-1-0-0
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor