+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0034
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0034
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0034
- 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- :Rerefer to S12 - Rules
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 26-3-1-0-0
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 7, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 60
March 2, 2018: H09 - Minerals
- Yeas: 9
February 27, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 21, 2018: S12 - Rules
- Yeas: 5
February 16, 2018: Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 26-3-1-0-0
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1