+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0071
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0071
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0071
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0071
- Concur:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Concurrence
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Placed on General File
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
- Placed on General File
- S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
- Received for Introduction
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2017: Concur
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 2
February 28, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 2
February 15, 2017: H08 - Transportation
- Yeas: 9
January 30, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2017: S08 - Transportation
- Yeas: 5