+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- H COW:Failed 12-46-2-0-0
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 25-4-1-0-0
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 9, 2020: H COW:Failed 12-46-2-0-0
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 46
March 4, 2020: H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 26, 2020: S 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
February 14, 2020: S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
February 12, 2020: S Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 25-4-1-0-0
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Bouchard
Type:
Primary Sponsor