+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 27, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
February 21, 2018: S05 - Agriculture
- Yeas: 5
February 15, 2018: Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1