+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0063
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Speaker Signed SEA No. 0063
On February 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- President Signed SEA No. 0063
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0063
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H05 Recommended Do Pass
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H05
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S05
- Received for Introduction
On January 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor