+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Failed 13-16-0-0-1
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- S02 - Appropriations:No Recommendation 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-0-1
- :Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
- S Received for Introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
March 24, 2021: S 3rd Reading:Failed 13-16-0-0-1
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 16
March 10, 2021: S02 - Appropriations:No Recommendation 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
March 5, 2021: S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-0-1
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsor
Pappas
Type:
Primary Sponsor