+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed SEA No. 0046
- Assigned Chapter Number 99
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- S Concur:Passed 22-7-1-0-0
- Assigned Number SEA No. 0046
- S President Signed SEA No. 0046
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed SEA No. 0046
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- H SF0102H3002: Ruled not in order pursuant to Mason's Section 159: 12-46-2-0
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 43-15-2-0-0
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- S Received for Concurrence
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-1-0
- S Placed on General File
- S COW:Passed
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 21-9-0-0-0
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill Number Assigned
- S Received for Introduction
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (7)
March 10, 2022: S Concur:Passed 22-7-1-0-0
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 7
March 9, 2022: H SF0102H3002: Ruled not in order pursuant to Mason's Section 159: 12-46-2-0
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 46
March 9, 2022: H 3rd Reading:Passed 43-15-2-0-0
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 15
March 2, 2022: H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 24, 2022: S 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
February 22, 2022: S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-1-0
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 1
February 17, 2022: S Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 21-9-0-0-0
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
+ − Sponsor
Hicks
Type:
Primary Sponsor