+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEJR No. 0003
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEJR No. 0003
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEJR No. 0003
- Assigned Number HEJR No. 0003
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Did Concur
- Received for Concurrence
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
- Placed on General File
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S07
- Received for Introduction
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 19, 2010 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor