+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEJR No. 0001
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEJR No. 0001
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEJR No. 0001
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEJR No. 0001
- 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
- Placed on General File
- S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 51-0-9-0-0
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 29, 2016: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 25, 2016: S06 - Travel
- Yeas: 5
February 18, 2016: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
February 12, 2016: H06 - Travel
- Yeas: 9
February 10, 2016: Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 51-0-9-0-0
- Yeas: 51
- Present/NV: 9