+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Did Not Consider in CoW
- COW
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 33-24-3-0-0
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
- Placed on General File
- H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On December 30, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 14, 2017: S03 - Revenue
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
January 19, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 3
January 17, 2017: H01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4