+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEJR No. 0002
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Chapter Number
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEJR No. 0002
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEJR No. 0002
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEJR No. 0002
- 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Laid Back
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Placed on General File
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 35-23-2-0-0
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On December 20, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 10
February 14, 2017: S03 - Revenue
- Yeas: 5
January 19, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 2
January 18, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 43
- Present/NV: 2
January 16, 2017: H01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor